ME LD1780 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Transfer Funds to the Maine Clean Election Fund To Provide Adequate Funding for Maine Clean Election Fund Candidates

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Transfer Funds to the Maine Clean Election Fund To Provide Adequate Funding for Maine Clean Election Fund Candidates

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #551 (Y: 14 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-22 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #532 (Y: 76 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-13SenateIn possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
2018-05-02SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748.
2018-03-29SenateOn motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2018-03-28HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-03-28HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2018-03-27SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-665) in concurrence
2018-03-27SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-665) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence
2018-03-27SenateREAD ONCE
2018-03-27SenateSubsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-665) Report ACCEPTED
2018-03-27SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 551 Yeas 14 - Nays 21 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
2018-03-27SenateMotion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin to Accept the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report FAILED.
2018-03-27SenateReports Read
2018-03-22HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-03-22HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-665).
2018-03-22HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2018-03-22HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-665) was READ and ADOPTED.
2018-03-22HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2018-03-22HouseROLL CALL NO. 532 (Yeas 76 - Nays 67 - Absent 8 - Excused 0)
2018-03-22HouseOn motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2018-03-22HouseReports READ.
2018-01-23SenateOn motion by Senator Mason of Androscoggin REFERRED to the Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence.
2018-01-23SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2018-01-18HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-01-18HouseSubsequently, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS.
2018-01-18HouseSpeaker laid before the House
2018-01-16HouseUnfinished Business
2018-01-11HouseUnfinished Business
2018-01-09HouseUnfinished Business
2018-01-09HouseLater today assigned.
2018-01-09HouseOn motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, TABLED pending REFERENCE.
2018-01-09HouseReport was READ and ACCEPTED.
2018-01-09HouseRepresentative LUCHINI for the Commission on Governmental Ethics and Election Practices pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 21-A, section 1124, subsection 4, reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback