ME LD1780 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-13 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Enhance Career Pathways for Adult Learners

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Enhance Career Pathways for Adult Learners

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-13 (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2012-03-12 (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2012-03-12 (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2012-03-08 (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2012-03-08 (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-410)
2012-03-08 (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2012-03-08 (H) Under suspension of the rules
2012-03-08 (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2012-03-07 (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
2012-03-07 (S) READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-410).
2012-03-07 (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
2012-03-06 (S) ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
2012-03-06 (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-410) READ and ADOPTED.
2012-03-06 (S) READ ONCE.
2012-03-06 (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED.
2012-01-19 (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2012-01-19 (H) Bill REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
2012-01-19 (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
2012-01-19 (S) On motion by Senator Langley of Hancock REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS
2012-01-19 (S) suggested and ordered printed
2012-01-19 (S) Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback