ME LD178 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Failed on June 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - RELEASED.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Failed on June 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - RELEASED.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Support Reentry and Reintegration into the Community
Title
An Act to Support Reentry and Reintegration into the Community
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-27 | Senate | RELEASED. |
2023-06-27 | Senate | HELD at the Request of Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland. |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With Acceptance of Report A Ought Not To Pass ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2023-06-26 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-26 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2023-06-26 | House | Subsequently, on motion of Representative SALISBURY of Westbrook, REPORT A Ought Not to Pass was ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-26 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2023-06-23 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-23 | House | Later today assigned. |
2023-06-23 | House | On motion of Representative SALISBURY of Westbrook, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Any Report. |
2023-06-23 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2023-06-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator BEEBE-CENTER of Knox Bill and accompanying papers COMMITTED to the Committee on Judiciary |
2023-06-21 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM/OTP-AM |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Reports READ |
2023-05-15 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-05-15 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-05-03 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-22 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-01-17 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-01-17 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=178&snum=131 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0082&item=1&snum=131 |