ME LD1779 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-17 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-17 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Update the Career and Technical Education Laws
Title
An Act To Update the Career and Technical Education Laws
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-17 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. | |
2012-05-17 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-05-17 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2012-05-16 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-05-16 | (H) The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-416) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-604) thereto | |
2012-05-16 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. | |
2012-05-16 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-416) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-604) thereto, in NON-CONCURRENCE. | |
2012-05-16 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-416) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-604) thereto ADOPTED, in NON-CONCURRENCE. | |
2012-05-16 | (S) On further motion by same Senator, Senate Amendment "A" (S-604) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-416) READ and ADOPTED. (Remarks Made) | |
2012-05-16 | (S) On further motion by same Senator, under further suspension of the Rules, RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (S-416), in concurrence. | |
2012-05-16 | (S) On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock, under suspension of the Rules, RECONSIDERED PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-416), in concurrence. | |
2012-05-16 | (S) TAKEN from the Special Appropriations Table by Senator ROSEN of Hancock. | |
2012-03-13 | (S) On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence. | |
2012-03-12 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-12 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-416) | |
2012-03-08 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Under suspension of the rules | |
2012-03-08 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-416). | |
2012-03-08 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2012-03-07 | (S) ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. | |
2012-03-07 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-416) READ and ADOPTED. | |
2012-03-07 | (S) READ ONCE. | |
2012-03-07 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED. | |
2012-01-19 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-01-19 | (H) Bill REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. | |
2012-01-19 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. | |
2012-01-19 | (S) On motion by Senator Langley of Hancock REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS | |
2012-01-19 | (S) suggested and ordered printed | |
2012-01-19 | (S) Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS |