ME LD1774 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-20 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-20 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding the Matching Funds Provisions of the Maine Clean Election Act
Title
An Act Regarding the Matching Funds Provisions of the Maine Clean Election Act
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-20 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. | |
2012-03-19 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-19 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 255 (Yeas 77 - Nays 67 - Absent 6 - Excused 0) (Vacancy 1) | |
2012-03-19 | (H) Subsequently, PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2012-03-19 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 254 (Yeas 67 - Nays 77 - Absent 6 - Excused 0) (Vacancy 1) | |
2012-03-19 | (H) Motion of Representative RUSSELL of Portland to INDEFINITELY POSTPONE the Bill and accompanying papers FAILED. | |
2012-03-15 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith. | |
2012-03-15 | (S) PREVAILED | |
2012-03-15 | (S) (20 -Yeas, 14 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 1 -Absent) | |
2012-03-15 | (S) Roll Call Number 375 | |
2012-03-15 | (S) On motion by Senator FARNHAM of Penobscot, the Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY HOUSE AMENDMENT "C" (H-780), in concurrence. (Remarks Made) (Roll Call Ordered) | |
2012-03-14 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-14 | (H) In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. | |
2012-03-14 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 252 (Yeas 74 - Nays 66 - Absent 10 - Excused 0) (Vacancy 1) | |
2012-03-14 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by House Amendment "C" (H-780). | |
2012-03-14 | (H) On motion of Representative BEAULIEU of Auburn, House Amendment "C" (H-780) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2012-03-14 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 251 (Yeas 72 - Nays 68 - Absent 10 - Excused 0) (Vacancy 1) | |
2012-03-14 | (H) On motion of Representative CURTIS of Madison, House Amendment "E" (H-784) was INDEFINITELY POSTPONED. | |
2012-03-14 | (H) On motion of Representative CAREY of Lewiston, House Amendment "E" (H-784) was READ. (Roll Call Requested on Adoption) | |
2012-03-14 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 250 (Yeas 72 - Nays 67 - Absent 11 - Excused 0) (Vacancy 1) | |
2012-03-14 | (H) On motion of Representative CURTIS of Madison, House Amendment "D" (H-781) was INDEFINITELY POSTPONED. | |
2012-03-14 | (H) On motion of Representative CAREY of Lewiston, House Amendment "D" (H-781) was READ. (Roll Call Ordered on Adoption) | |
2012-03-14 | (H) Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. | |
2012-03-14 | (H) The Bill was READ ONCE. | |
2012-03-14 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 249 (Yeas 74 - Nays 64 - Absent 12 - Excused 0) (Vacancy 1) | |
2012-03-14 | (H) Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass Pursuant to Resolve 2011, chapter 103, section 2 Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2012-03-14 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2012-03-13 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2012-03-12 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2012-03-12 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2012-03-12 | (H) On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass Pursuant to Resolve 2011, chapter 103, section 2 Report. | |
2012-03-12 | (H) Representative BEAULIEU of Auburn moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass Pursuant to Resolve 2011, chapter 103, section 2 Report. | |
2012-03-12 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) PREVAILED | |
2012-03-08 | (S) (18 -Yeas, 15 -Nays, 2 -Excused, 0 -Absent) | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Roll Call Number 365 | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Subsequently, PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. (Roll Call Ordered) | |
2012-03-08 | (S) PREVAILED | |
2012-03-08 | (S) (18 -Yeas, 15 -Nays, 2 -Excused, 0 -Absent) | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Roll Call Number 364 | |
2012-03-08 | (S) On motion by Senator FARNHAM of Penobscot Senate Amendment "F" (S-421) INDEFINITELY POSTPONED. (Remarks Made) (Roll Call Ordered) | |
2012-03-08 | (S) On motion by Senator PATRICK of Oxford Senate Amendment "F" (S-421) READ. (Remarks Made) | |
2012-03-08 | (S) FAILED | |
2012-03-08 | (S) (9 -Yeas, 23 -Nays, 2 -Excused, 1 -Absent) | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Roll Call Number 363 | |
2012-03-08 | (S) On motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec, Senate Amendment "D" (S-400) READ and FAILED ADOPTION. (Remarks Made) (Roll Call Ordered) | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) TAKEN from the Table by the President. | |
2012-03-07 | (S) (Unfinished Business) | |
2012-03-06 | (S) (Unfinished Business) | |
2012-03-01 | (S) (Unfinished Business) | |
2012-03-01 | (S) On motion by Senator COURTNEY of York TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) READ ONCE. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) On motion by Senator FARNHAM of Penobscot, the Majority Ought to Pass pursuant to Resolve ACCEPTED . | |
2012-03-01 | (S) TAKEN from the Table by the President. | |
2012-02-29 | (S) (Unfinished Business) | |
2012-02-28 | (S) (Unfinished Business) | |
2012-02-23 | (S) (Unfinished Business) | |
2012-02-22 | (S) (Unfinished Business) | |
2012-02-21 | (S) (Unfinished Business) | |
2012-02-16 | (S) (Unfinished Business) | |
2012-02-15 | (S) (Unfinished Business) | |
2012-02-14 | (S) (Unfinished Business) | |
2012-02-09 | (S) (Unfinished Business) | |
2012-02-08 | (S) (Unfinished Business) | |
2012-02-07 | (S) (Unfinished Business) | |
2012-02-02 | (S) (Unfinished Business) | |
2012-01-31 | (S) (Unfinished Business) | |
2012-01-31 | (S) (Unfinished Business) | |
2012-01-26 | (S) (Unfinished Business) | |
2012-01-26 | (S) (Unfinished Business) | |
2012-01-24 | (S) (Unfinished Business) | |
2012-01-24 | (S) (Unfinished Business) | |
2012-01-19 | (S) (Unfinished Business) | |
2012-01-19 | (S) On motion by Senator FARNHAM of Penobscot TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT. | |
2012-01-19 | (S) Reports READ |