ME LD1771 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Sent to the Engrossing Department.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Sent to the Engrossing Department.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Stabilize Vulnerable Families
Title
An Act To Stabilize Vulnerable Families
Sponsors
Sen. Amy Volk [R] | Rep. Karen Vachon [R] | Sen. Catherine Breen [D] | Sen. Lisa Keim [R] |
Sen. Michael Thibodeau [R] | Rep. Sara Gideon [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #658 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #658 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #658 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | House | Sent to the Engrossing Department. |
2018-05-02 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-05-02 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 658V 148 having voted in the affirmative and 0 in the negative, with 3 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2018-05-02 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2018-05-02 | Senate | LD 1771 In Senate, May 2, 2018, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 34 IN FAVOR and 0 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2018-04-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-12 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-04-11 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-11 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-449). |
2018-04-11 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2018-04-11 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-449). |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-449) READ and ADOPTED. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2018-01-09 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-01-09 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |