ME LD177 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Support Apprenticeship Programs
Title
An Act To Support Apprenticeship Programs
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Cuddy [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #520 (Y: 76 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-25 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-04-25 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-25 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-927) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-586) thereto. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2022-04-25 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-927) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-586) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-927) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-586) thereto ADOPTED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-586) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-927) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Under further suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-927) was ADOPTED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-927) |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2022-04-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-07 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-927) in concurrence |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-927) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-04-07 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2022-04-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Reports Read |
2022-04-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-05 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-927). |
2022-04-05 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2022-04-05 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-927) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-04-05 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2022-04-05 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 520 (Yeas 76 - Nays 51 - Absent 20 - Excused 0 - Vacant 4) |
2022-04-05 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2022-04-05 | House | On motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2022-04-05 | House | Reports READ. |
2022-03-16 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2022-03-16 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-07-19 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302. |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2021-05-21 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2021-05-21 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-01-21 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-01-21 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on January 21, 2021. |