ME LD177 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Protect Farm Animals from Noise from the Discharge of Fireworks and Explosives
Title
An Act To Protect Farm Animals from Noise from the Discharge of Fireworks and Explosives
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-09 | Senate | Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD). |
2015-04-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2015-04-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-04-07 | House | On motion of Representative FOWLE of Vassalboro, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2015-04-07 | House | Reports READ. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | On motion by Senator Rosen of Hancock, REFERRED to the Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, in concurrence. |
2015-01-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-01-29 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2015-01-29 | House | Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=177&snum=127 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0135&item=1&snum=127 |