ME LD1769 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Conform the Laws Regarding a Salaried Employee Who Is Exempt from Overtime and Minimum Wage Requirements to Federal Law

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Conform the Laws Regarding a Salaried Employee Who Is Exempt from Overtime and Minimum Wage Requirements to Federal Law

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #541 (Y: 76 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #553 (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-02HousePlaced in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
2018-04-02HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-04-02HouseThe House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report.
2018-03-29SenateSent down for concurrence
2018-03-29SenateOn motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of Minority OUGHT TO PASS AS AMENDED Report AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-404)
2018-03-28HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-03-28HouseIn NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
2018-03-28HouseROLL CALL NO. 541 (Yeas 76 - Nays 70 - Absent 5 - Excused 0)
2018-03-28HouseOn motion of Representative FECTEAU of Biddeford, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
2018-03-28HouseReports READ.
2018-03-27SenateSent down for concurrence
2018-03-27SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-404)
2018-03-27SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-404) READ and ADOPTED
2018-03-27SenateREAD ONCE
2018-03-27SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 553 Yeas 20 - Nays 15 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
2018-03-27SenateOn motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
2018-03-27SenateReports READ
2018-01-09HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-01-09HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT.
2018-01-03SenateCommittee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback