ME LD1764 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Streamline Advocacy for Maine Small Businesses by Relocating the Bureau of the Special Advocate within the Department of the Secretary of State to the Department of Economic and Community Development
Title
An Act To Streamline Advocacy for Maine Small Businesses by Relocating the Bureau of the Special Advocate within the Department of the Secretary of State to the Department of Economic and Community Development
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - House - Table Until Later RC #561 (Y: 67 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2018-04-03 - House - Recede And Concur RC #560 (Y: 71 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #570 (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - Table Until Later RC #516 (Y: 64 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2018-04-03 - House - Recede And Concur RC #560 (Y: 71 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #570 (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - Table Until Later RC #516 (Y: 64 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2018-04-04 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of Minority OUGHT TO PASS AS AMENDED Report AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-638) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-426) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2018-04-03 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-03 | House | Subsequently, the House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2018-04-03 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 561 (Yeas 67 - Nays 74 - Absent 10 - Excused 0) |
2018-04-03 | House | Motion of Representative ESPLING of New Gloucester to TABLE until later in today's session FAILED. |
2018-04-03 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 560 (Yeas 71 - Nays 72 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) |
2018-04-03 | House | Motion of Representative ESPLING of New Gloucester to RECEDE and CONCUR FAILED. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-638) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-426) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-638) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-426) thereto ADOPTED |
2018-04-02 | Senate | On motion by Senator CUSHING of Penobscot Senate Amendment "A" (S-426) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-638) READ and ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-638) READ |
2018-04-02 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 570 Yeas 18 - Nays 15 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 |
2018-04-02 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-638) Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis asked and received leave of the Senate to Withdraw his motion to Accept the Majority Ought Not To Pass Report. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-03-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator CUSHING of Penobscot TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report in Concurrence. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report in Concurrence. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Reports READ |
2018-03-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-15 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2018-03-15 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 516 (Yeas 64 - Nays 73 - Absent 14 - Excused 0) |
2018-03-15 | House | Motion of Representative ESPLING of New Gloucester to TABLE pending the motion of Representative MARTIN of Sinclair to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report FAILED. |
2018-03-15 | House | Representative MARTIN of Sinclair moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2018-03-15 | House | Reports READ. |
2018-01-09 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT in concurrence |
2018-01-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-01-03 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2018-01-03 | House | Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed. |