ME LD1762 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Ensure Sustainable Health Care Access in the Jackman Region

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Ensure Sustainable Health Care Access in the Jackman Region

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-09 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #732 (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-07-09 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #723 (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-09Senatein concurrence
2018-07-09SenateLD 1762 In Senate, July 9, 2018, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 32 IN FAVOR and 1 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
2018-07-09HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-07-09HouseROLL CALL NO. 723V 141 having voted in the affirmative and 1 in the negative, with 9 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted.
2018-07-09HouseThis Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
2018-06-21SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
2018-06-21HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-06-21HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2018-06-21HouseThis being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
2018-06-21HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-06-21HouseThe House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-676) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-516) thereto.
2018-06-20SenateSent down for concurrence
2018-06-20SenatePASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-676) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-516) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
2018-06-20SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-676) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-516) thereto ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE
2018-06-20SenateOn further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-516) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-676) READ and ADOPTED
2018-06-20SenateUnder further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-676) was ADOPTED
2018-06-20SenateUnder suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-676)
2018-06-20SenateOn Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
2018-05-02SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748.
2018-04-03SenateOn motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
2018-04-02HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-04-02HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2018-04-02HouseThis being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
2018-03-28SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-676) in concurrence
2018-03-28SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-676) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence
2018-03-28SenateREAD ONCE
2018-03-28SenateOn motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence
2018-03-28SenateReports Read
2018-03-27HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-03-27HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-676).
2018-03-27HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2018-03-27HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-676) was READ and ADOPTED.
2018-03-27HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2018-03-27HouseOn motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2018-03-27HouseReports READ.
2018-01-09SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence
2018-01-03HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-01-03HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
2018-01-03HouseCommittee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback