ME LD1755 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 15 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to Exempt Certain Youth Development Nonprofit Organizations from Sales Tax and the Service Provider Tax

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act to Exempt Certain Youth Development Nonprofit Organizations from Sales Tax and the Service Provider Tax

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-10SenateCARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482.
2023-07-26SenateCARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847.
2023-06-20SenateOn motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2023-06-16HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-06-16HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2023-06-15HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-06-15HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-315).
2023-06-15HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2023-06-15HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2023-06-14SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
2023-06-14SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-315).
2023-06-14SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-315) READ and ADOPTED.
2023-06-14SenateREAD ONCE.
2023-06-14SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED.
2023-06-14JointReported Out: OTP-AM
2023-05-16JointVoted: OTP-AM
2023-05-16JointWork Session Held
2023-04-20HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-04-20HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION.
2023-04-20SenateCommittee on TAXATION suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on TAXATION Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback