ME LD1746 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Ensure That Low-income Residents of the State Have Access to Telephone Services
Title
An Act To Ensure That Low-income Residents of the State Have Access to Telephone Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-21 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2018-06-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-06-21 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-06-21 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-06-21 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-390) andSenate Amendment "A" (S-524). |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-390) AND Senate Amendment "A" (S-524) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2018-06-20 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-524) READ and ADOPTED |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-390) |
2018-06-20 | Senate | On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2018-03-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-27 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-03-22 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-22 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-390). |
2018-03-22 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2018-03-22 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-390). |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-390) READ and ADOPTED. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2017-12-19 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on December 19, 2017 and REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |