ME LD1745 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Establish the Wood Energy Program
Title
An Act To Establish the Wood Energy Program
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Jackson [D] | Rep. Stephen Stanley [D] | Sen. Michael Carpenter [D] | Sen. Thomas Saviello [R] |
Rep. David Woodsome [R] | Rep. Seth Berry [D] | Rep. Sara Gideon [D] | Rep. John Martin [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #664 (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-17 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #609 (Y: 116 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #633 (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #609 (Y: 116 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #633 (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2018-05-02 | Senate | LD 1745 In Senate, May 2, 2018, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 22 IN FAVOR and 12 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2018-04-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-17 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-04-17 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2018-04-17 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-17 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-464). |
2018-04-17 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2018-04-17 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-464) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2018-04-17 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2018-04-17 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 609 (Yeas 116 - Nays 27 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) |
2018-04-17 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2018-04-17 | House | Reports READ. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-464) |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-464) READ and ADOPTED |
2018-04-17 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 633 Yeas 23 - Nays 12 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator WOODSOME of York The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-12-19 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on December 19, 2017 and REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |