ME LD1745 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Preserve Maine's Long-term Care Facilities
Title
An Act To Preserve Maine's Long-term Care Facilities
Sponsors
Rep. Katherine Cassidy [D] | Sen. David C. Burns [R] | Rep. Peter Doak [R] | Rep. Lawrence Lockman [R] |
Sen. Joyce Maker [R] | Rep. Beth Turner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD). |
2014-03-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator CAIN of Penobscot PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT , in concurrence. |
2014-03-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-21 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-690), in concurrence. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-690) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2014-03-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-18 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-690) |
2014-03-18 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2014-03-18 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2014-03-18 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2014-01-30 | Senate | On motion by Senator Hill of York, REFERRED to the Committee on Health and Human Services, in concurrence. |
2014-01-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-01-28 | House | Subsequently, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2014-01-28 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2014-01-23 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-01-23 | House | Later today assigned. |
2014-01-23 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, TABLED pending REFERENCE. |
2014-01-23 | House | Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed. |