ME LD1737 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-11 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-11 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Extending the Date by Which the Family Law Advisory Commission Must Report on Its Study of the Uniform Parentage Act and Other Similar Laws and Proposals
Title
Resolve, Extending the Date by Which the Family Law Advisory Commission Must Report on Its Study of the Uniform Parentage Act and Other Similar Laws and Proposals
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-11 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2014-02-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-02-06 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2014-02-04 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-02-04 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2014-01-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator VALENTINO of York Report Rejected , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-01-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator VALENTINO of York Tabled pending ACCEPTANCE of the Report |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Reports READ |
2014-01-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-01-16 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY and printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |
2014-01-16 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2014-01-16 | House | Representative PRIEST for the Family Law Advisory Commission pursuant to Resolve 2013, chapter 12, section 2, Reports that the Resolve be REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY and printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |