ME LD1733 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 27 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 27 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Ensure Comprehensive Interdepartmental Planning, Coordination and Collaboration on Aging Policy
Title
An Act To Ensure Comprehensive Interdepartmental Planning, Coordination and Collaboration on Aging Policy
Sponsors
Rep. Jessica Fay [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With Bill and accompanying papers COMMITTED to the Committee on State and Local Government in concurrence |
2020-03-12 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-03-12 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2020-03-12 | House | On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland the Bill and accompanying papers were COMMITTED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2020-03-12 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2020-03-10 | House | Unfinished Business |
2020-03-05 | House | Unfinished Business |
2020-03-03 | House | Unfinished Business |
2020-03-03 | House | Later today assigned. |
2020-03-03 | House | On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-682), in concurrence. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-682) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence |
2020-02-25 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2020-02-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator CLAXTON of Androscoggin the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Reports Read |
2020-02-20 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-02-20 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-682). |
2020-02-20 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2020-02-20 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-682) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2020-02-20 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2020-02-20 | House | On motion of Representative MARTIN of Sinclair, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2020-02-20 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator Claxton of Androscoggin, REFERRED to the Committee on State and Local Government, in concurrence. |
2019-05-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-14 | House | On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2019-05-14 | House | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed. |