ME LD1731 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-17 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-17 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Combat Human Sex Trafficking
Title
An Act To Combat Human Sex Trafficking
Sponsors
Sen. Jonathan Courtney [R] | Sen. William Diamond [D] | Sen. Stanley Gerzofsky [D] | Sen. Anne Haskell [D] |
Sen. Garrett Mason [R] | Rep. Robert Nutting [R] | Sen. Debra Plowman [R] | Sen. Gary Plummer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-17 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. | |
2012-05-17 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-05-17 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2012-05-17 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-05-17 | (H) The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-502) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-601) thereto | |
2012-05-16 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. | |
2012-05-16 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-502) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-601) thereto, in NON-CONCURRENCE. | |
2012-05-16 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-502) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-601) thereto ADOPTED, in NON-CONCURRENCE. | |
2012-05-16 | (S) On further motion by same Senator, Senate Amendment "A" (S-601) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-502) READ and ADOPTED. (Remarks Made) | |
2012-05-16 | (S) On further motion by same Senator, under further suspension of the Rules, RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (S-502), in concurrence. | |
2012-05-16 | (S) On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock, under suspension of the Rules, RECONSIDERED PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-502), in concurrence. | |
2012-05-16 | (S) TAKEN from the Special Appropriations Table by Senator ROSEN of Hancock. | |
2012-04-03 | (S) On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence. | |
2012-04-03 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-04-03 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2012-04-02 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-04-02 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-502). | |
2012-04-02 | (H) Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. | |
2012-04-02 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (S-502) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2012-04-02 | (H) The Bill was READ ONCE. | |
2012-04-02 | (H) On motion of Representative PLUMMER of Windham, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2012-04-02 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2012-03-30 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. | |
2012-03-30 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-502).. | |
2012-03-30 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-502) READ and ADOPTED . | |
2012-03-30 | (S) READ ONCE. | |
2012-03-30 | (S) On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin the Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-502) Report ACCEPTED . | |
2012-03-30 | (S) Reports READ. | |
2012-01-05 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-01-05 | (H) Bill REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. | |
2012-01-04 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. | |
2012-01-04 | (S) On motion by Senator Mason of Androscoggin REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY | |
2012-01-04 | (S) suggested and ordered printed | |
2012-01-04 | (S) Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY |