ME LD1730 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Change the Procedures for Veterinarians in the Controlled Substances Prescription Monitoring Program
Title
An Act To Change the Procedures for Veterinarians in the Controlled Substances Prescription Monitoring Program
Sponsors
Sen. James Hamper [R] | Rep. Seth Berry [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-03 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2018-04-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-02 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-03-29 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-29 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-422). |
2018-03-29 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2018-03-29 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-422). |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-422) READ and ADOPTED. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2017-12-19 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on December 19, 2017 and REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |