ME LD1728 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-05 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-05 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Prohibit Possession of a Replica or Simulated Firearm on or near School Property
Title
An Act To Prohibit Possession of a Replica or Simulated Firearm on or near School Property
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn Hill [D] | Rep. Bruce Macdonald [D] | Sen. Stanley Gerzofsky [D] | Rep. Rebecca Millett [D] |
Sen. Mark Dion [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2014-03-05 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-05 | House | On motion of Representative MacDONALD of Boothbay, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2014-03-05 | House | Reports READ. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | On motion by Senator MILLETT of Cumberland the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2014-01-16 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-01-16 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator Millett of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS |
2014-01-16 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President Pro Tem. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-01-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator HASKELL of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending motion by Senator MILLETT of Cumberland to REFER to the Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs |
2014-01-14 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1728&snum=126 |
Text | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0686&item=1&snum=126 |