ME LD1725 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - LD 1725 In Senate, March 22, 2018, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 33 IN FAVOR and 0 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - LD 1725 In Senate, March 22, 2018, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 33 IN FAVOR and 0 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Ensure Stability for Certain Holders of Liquor Licenses
Title
An Act To Ensure Stability for Certain Holders of Liquor Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #545 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #527 (Y: 134 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #527 (Y: 134 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Senate | LD 1725 In Senate, March 22, 2018, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 33 IN FAVOR and 0 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2018-03-20 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-20 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 527V 134 having voted in the affirmative and 4 in the negative, with 13 being absent, and 0 excused, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2018-03-20 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2018-03-20 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2018-03-15 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-03-15 | House | Later today assigned. |
2018-03-15 | House | On motion of Representative GOLDEN of Lewiston the Bill was TABLED pending RECONSIDERATION. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2018-02-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-02-22 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-585), in concurrence. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-585) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence |
2018-02-15 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2018-02-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-02-13 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-585). |
2018-02-13 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2018-02-13 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-12-22 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2017-12-22 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on December 19, 2017. |