ME LD1723 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding Winter Maintenance on Private Roads in the Town of Windham
Title
An Act Regarding Winter Maintenance on Private Roads in the Town of Windham
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2021-06-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-14 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-14 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-503) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-526) in concurrence |
2021-06-10 | Senate | House Amendment "A" (H-526) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-503) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-503) READ |
2021-06-10 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2021-06-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-09 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-503) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-526) thereto. |
2021-06-09 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-09 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-503) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-526) thereto was ADOPTED. |
2021-06-09 | House | On motion of Representative BRYANT of Windham, House Amendment "A" (H-526) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-503) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-09 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-503) was READ. |
2021-06-09 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-09 | House | The Committee Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-09 | House | On OBJECTION of Representative BRYANT of Windham REMOVED. |
2021-06-09 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2021-06-09 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-05-26 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2021-05-26 | Joint | Work Session Reconsidered |
2021-05-24 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2021-05-24 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-05-19 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT in concurrence |
2021-05-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-05-19 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2021-05-19 | House | Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed. |