ME LD1721 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-05 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-05 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding Dignity for Women in Correctional Facilities
Title
An Act Regarding Dignity for Women in Correctional Facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-03-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-31 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-824), in concurrence. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-824) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2022-03-24 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-24 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-824). |
2022-03-24 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2022-03-24 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2022-03-22 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2022-03-03 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2022-03-03 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-07-19 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302. |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2021-05-26 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2021-05-25 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-05-19 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence |
2021-05-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-05-19 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2021-05-19 | House | Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |