ME LD1721 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Campaign Reports and Finances Laws and the Maine Clean Election Act
Title
An Act To Amend the Campaign Reports and Finances Laws and the Maine Clean Election Act
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-07 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-06 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-05 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-05 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-195). |
2019-06-05 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-06-05 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-195) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-06-05 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-06-05 | House | On motion of Representative SCHNECK of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-05 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-195) |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-195) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-06-04 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-06-04 | Senate | On motion by Senator LUCHINI of Hancock the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-05-14 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-14 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |