ME LD1720 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Amend the So-called Dig Safe Law

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend the So-called Dig Safe Law

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-07SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-06-06HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-06HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-06-05HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-05HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
2019-06-05HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2019-06-05HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2019-06-04SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
2019-06-04SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
2019-06-04SenateREAD ONCE
2019-06-04SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED.
2019-05-14HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-14HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY.
2019-05-14SenateCommittee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback