ME LD1720 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Improve the Operations of the Office of the Attorney General
Title
An Act To Improve the Operations of the Office of the Attorney General
Sponsors
Rep. Erik Jorgensen [D] | Sen. Linda Valentino [D] | Rep. Jarrod Crockett [R] | Rep. Jennifer DeChant [D] |
Rep. Dennis Keschl [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD). |
2014-03-24 | Senate | On motion by Senator HILL of York PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required , in concurrence. |
2014-03-24 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-24 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-707), in concurrence. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-707) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2014-03-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-19 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-707) |
2014-03-19 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2014-03-19 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2014-03-19 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2014-01-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator Valentino of York, REFERRED to the Committee on Judiciary, in concurrence. |
2014-01-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-01-09 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2014-01-09 | House | Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |