ME LD1719 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 11 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Implement a Regulatory Structure for Adult Use Marijuana

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Implement a Regulatory Structure for Adult Use Marijuana

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-02 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #670 (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #653 (Y: 109 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #609 (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #585 (Y: 112 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-02Senatein concurrence
2018-05-02SenateLD 1719 In Senate, May 2, 2018, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 28 IN FAVOR and 6 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
2018-05-02HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-05-02HouseROLL CALL NO. 653V 109 having voted in the affirmative and 39 in the negative, with 3 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted.
2018-05-02HouseThis Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
2018-04-17SenatePASSAGE TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
2018-04-12HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-04-12HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2018-04-12HouseThis being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
2018-04-11SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-733) in concurrence
2018-04-11SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-733) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence
2018-04-11SenateREAD ONCE
2018-04-11SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 609 Yeas 24 - Nays 10 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
2018-04-11SenateSubsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-733) Report ACCEPTED in concurrence
2018-04-11SenateTaken from the table by the President
2018-04-11SenateOn further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report,
2018-04-11SenateSenator KATZ of Kennebec moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
2018-04-11SenateReports READ
2018-04-10HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-04-10HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-733).
2018-04-10HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2018-04-10HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-733) was READ and ADOPTED.
2018-04-10HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2018-04-10HouseROLL CALL NO. 585 (Yeas 112 - Nays 34 - Absent 5 - Excused 0)
2018-04-10HouseOn motion of Representative PIERCE of Falmouth, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2018-04-10HouseReports READ.
2017-12-22HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on MARIJUANA LEGALIZATION IMPLEMENTATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
2017-12-22HouseReceived by the Clerk of the House on December 19, 2017.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback