ME LD1711 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-16 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-16 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Summary
An Act To Clarify the Status of Prisoners
Title
An Act To Clarify the Status of Prisoners
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-16 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2010-03-11 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-03-11 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2010-03-09 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-676) in concurrence | |
2010-03-09 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME | |
2010-03-09 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2010-03-04 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2010-03-04 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-676) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2010-03-04 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2010-03-04 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence | |
2010-03-04 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-03-04 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-676) | |
2010-03-04 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2010-03-04 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2010-03-02 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2010-01-07 | (S) On motion by Senator Bartlett of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2010-01-06 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-01-06 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR. | |
2010-01-06 | (H) Committee on LABOR suggested and ordered printed. |