ME LD1710 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-22 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-22 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Summary
An Act Concerning Litigation Brought by the Attorney General To Enforce Provisions of the Forest Practices Laws
Title
An Act Concerning Litigation Brought by the Attorney General To Enforce Provisions of the Forest Practices Laws
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-22 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2010-03-18 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-03-18 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2010-03-16 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-682) in concurrence | |
2010-03-16 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2010-03-11 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2010-03-11 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-682) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2010-03-11 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2010-03-11 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence | |
2010-03-09 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-03-09 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-682) | |
2010-03-09 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2010-03-09 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2010-03-04 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2010-01-07 | (S) On motion by Senator Bliss of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2010-01-06 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-01-06 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. | |
2010-01-06 | (H) Committee on JUDICIARY suggested and ordered printed. |