ME LD1707 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Reduce the Cost of Care Resulting from Blood-borne Infectious Diseases
Title
An Act To Reduce the Cost of Care Resulting from Blood-borne Infectious Diseases
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Vachon [R] | Sen. James Dill [D] | Sen. Brian Langley [R] | Sen. Joyce Maker [R] |
Rep. Patrick Corey [R] | Sen. Matthew Harrington [R] | Rep. John Picchiotti [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-07-09 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #726 (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-07-09 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #711 (Y: 102 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #522 (Y: 13 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-02-27 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #495 (Y: 99 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-07-09 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #711 (Y: 102 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #522 (Y: 13 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-02-27 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #495 (Y: 99 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-09 | Senate | in concurrence |
2018-07-09 | Senate | LD 1707 In Senate, July 9, 2018, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 25 IN FAVOR and 8 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2018-07-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-07-09 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 711V 102 having voted in the affirmative and 40 in the negative, with 9 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2018-07-09 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2018-06-20 | Senate | On Motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2018-03-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-27 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | On motion by Senator MAKER of Washington The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-604) AND House Amendment "A" (H-648) in concurrence |
2018-03-20 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-20 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2018-03-20 | House | Subsequently, the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-604) and House Amendment "A" (H-648). |
2018-03-20 | House | On motion of Representative VACHON of Scarborough, House Amendment "A" (H-648) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2018-03-20 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2018-03-15 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-03-06 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-03-06 | House | Later today assigned. |
2018-03-06 | House | On further motion of same Representative TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-604). |
2018-03-06 | House | On further motion of the same Representative the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2018-03-06 | House | On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill FAILED PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-03-06 | House | FAILED PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-03-06 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-604) in concurrence |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-604) READ and ADOPTED |
2018-03-01 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-604) Report ACCEPTED |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 522 Yeas 13 - Nays 20 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report FAILED. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reports Read |
2018-02-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-02-27 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-604). |
2018-02-27 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2018-02-27 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-604) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2018-02-27 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2018-02-27 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 495 (Yeas 99 - Nays 40 - Absent 12 - Excused 0) |
2018-02-27 | House | On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2018-02-27 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-12-22 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2017-12-22 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on December 19, 2017. |