ME LD1707 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the State's Tax Laws
Title
An Act To Amend the State's Tax Laws
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2014-04-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-02 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2014-03-31 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-31 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-472). |
2014-03-31 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2014-03-31 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2014-03-31 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-472). |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-472) READ and ADOPTED. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2014-01-09 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-01-09 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | On motion by Senator Haskell of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION |
2014-01-08 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Committee on TAXATION |