ME LD1706 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Improve Public Safety through Expanded Department of Corrections Treatment, Education and Vocational Programs
Title
An Act To Improve Public Safety through Expanded Department of Corrections Treatment, Education and Vocational Programs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - House - Acc Min Otp As Amended Rep RC #523 (Y: 75 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2018-03-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock The Senate INSISTED ACCEPTANCE of Majority OUGHT NOT TO PASS Report In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2018-03-27 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-27 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-653). |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2018-03-22 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Reports Read |
2018-03-20 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-20 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-653). |
2018-03-20 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2018-03-20 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-653) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2018-03-20 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2018-03-20 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 523 (Yeas 75 - Nays 70 - Absent 6 - Excused 0) |
2018-03-20 | House | On further motion of same Representative the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2018-03-20 | House | Representative WARREN of Hallowell WITHDREW her motion to accept the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2018-03-20 | House | Representative WARREN of Hallowell moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2018-03-20 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-12-22 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2017-12-22 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on December 19, 2017. |