ME LD1705 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-02 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-02 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Summary
An Act To Align the Duties of School Boards Concerning Student Safety with the Requirements of the Federal Gun-Free Schools Act and To Prohibit the Discharge of Firearms within 500 Feet of Public and Private School Properties
Title
An Act To Align the Duties of School Boards Concerning Student Safety with the Requirements of the Federal Gun-Free Schools Act and To Prohibit the Discharge of Firearms within 500 Feet of Public and Private School Properties
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Bickford [R] | Sen. Gerald Davis [R] | Sen. Troy Jackson [D] | Rep. Stephen Lovejoy [D] |
Rep. John Martin [D] | Rep. Howard Mcfadden [R] | Sen. Richard Nass [R] | Rep. Wendy Pieh [D] |
Rep. Richard Wagner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-02 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2010-04-02 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-04-02 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 350 (Yeas 114 - Nays 28 - Absent 9 - Excused 0) | |
2010-04-02 | (H) Subsequently, PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2010-04-02 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2010-04-02 | (H) Later today assigned. (Roll Call Ordered) | |
2010-04-02 | (H) On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. | |
2010-03-31 | (S) On motion by Senator ALFOND of Cumberland The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED To PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-769) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "B" (H-805) thereto | |
2010-03-31 | (S) Subsequently Taken from the table by the President | |
2010-03-31 | (S) On motion by Senator BARTLETT of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION | |
2010-03-31 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-03-31 | (H) In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. | |
2010-03-31 | (H) Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-769) as Amended by House Amendment "B" (H-805) thereto | |
2010-03-31 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (H-769) as Amended by House Amendment "B" (H-805) thereto ADOPTED. | |
2010-03-31 | (H) On further motion of the same Representative, House Amendment "B" (H-805) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-769) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2010-03-31 | (H) On further motion of the same Representative, under FURTHER suspension of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-769). | |
2010-03-31 | (H) On motion of Representative SUTHERLAND of Chapman, under suspension of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-769). | |
2010-03-30 | (S) Sent forthwith to the Engrossing Division. | |
2010-03-30 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-769) in concurrence | |
2010-03-30 | (S) Taken from the table by the President | |
2010-03-29 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2010-03-29 | (S) On motion by Senator ALFOND of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-769) in concurrence | |
2010-03-29 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME | |
2010-03-29 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2010-03-26 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2010-03-26 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-769) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2010-03-26 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2010-03-26 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence | |
2010-03-25 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-03-25 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-769). | |
2010-03-25 | (H) Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. | |
2010-03-25 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (H-769) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2010-03-25 | (H) The Bill was READ ONCE. | |
2010-03-25 | (H) The Committee Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2010-03-25 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2010-03-24 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2010-03-24 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2010-03-24 | (H) On motion of Representative PIOTTI of Unity, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of the Committee Report. | |
2010-03-24 | (H) The Committee Report was READ. | |
2010-03-24 | (H) On OBJECTION of Representative PIOTTI of Unity REMOVED. | |
2010-03-24 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2010-03-24 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2010-03-23 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2010-01-07 | (S) On motion by Senator Alfond of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2010-01-06 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-01-06 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. | |
2010-01-06 | (H) Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed. |