ME LD170 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Allow and Recognize a Legal Name Change upon Marriage

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Allow and Recognize a Legal Name Change upon Marriage

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-09 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #697 (Y: 83 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-09HousePlaced in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
2018-07-09HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-07-09HouseROLL CALL NO. 697V 83 having voted in the affirmative and 60 in the negative, with 8 being absent, and 0 excused, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained.
2018-07-09HouseThis Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
2018-06-20SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
2018-06-20SenateOn Motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
2018-05-02SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748.
2017-08-02SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 601.
2017-06-07SenateOn motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT
2017-06-07SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was ENACTED
2017-06-07SenateRECALLED From Governor's Desk pursuant to Joint Order SP 582.
2017-06-01SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2017-05-31HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-05-31HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2017-05-30SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2017-05-30SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-274), in concurrence.
2017-05-30SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-274) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
2017-05-30SenateREAD ONCE.
2017-05-30SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2017-05-25HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-05-25HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-274).
2017-05-25HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2017-05-25HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2017-01-26SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence
2017-01-19HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-01-19HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
2017-01-19HouseCommittee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback