ME LD170 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. PASSED TO BE ENACTED , in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. PASSED TO BE ENACTED , in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Remove the 180-day Active Duty Requirement for the Property Tax Exemption for Vietnam Veterans
Title
An Act To Remove the 180-day Active Duty Requirement for the Property Tax Exemption for Vietnam Veterans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-30 | Senate | On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. PASSED TO BE ENACTED , in concurrence. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending , in concurrence. |
2015-03-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-26 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-15), in concurrence. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-15) READ and ADOPTED , in concurrence. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED , in concurrence. |
2015-03-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-19 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-15). |
2015-03-19 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2015-03-19 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2015-03-18 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-02-03 | Senate | On motion by Senator McCormick of Kennebec, REFERRED to the Committee on Taxation, in concurrence. |
2015-01-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-01-29 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2015-01-29 | House | Committee on Taxation suggested and ordered printed. |