ME LD17 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3, Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3, Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Eliminate Retirement Benefits and Paid Health Insurance for Legislators Elected after 2017
Title
An Act To Eliminate Retirement Benefits and Paid Health Insurance for Legislators Elected after 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Bradlee Farrin [R] | Sen. Eric Brakey [R] | Rep. Kathleen Dillingham [R] | Rep. Chad Grignon [R] |
Rep. Jeffery Hanley [R] | Rep. Lester Ordway [R] | Rep. Karleton Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3, Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD). |
2017-03-30 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report READ and ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-03-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-28 | House | On motion of Representative GATTINE of Westbrook, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-03-28 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-01-19 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-01-19 | House | Subsequently, the House RECEDED and CONCURRED to REFERENCE to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS. |
2017-01-19 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-01-17 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-01-17 | House | Later today assigned. |
2017-01-17 | House | On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, TABLED pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-01-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-01-11 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS |
2017-01-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-01-10 | House | On motion of Representative GATTINE of Westbrook, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2017-01-10 | House | Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=17&snum=128 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0018&item=1&snum=128 |