ME LD17 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-07 - Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-07 - Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Require Motorists To Stop for Pedestrians in Crosswalks
Title
An Act To Require Motorists To Stop for Pedestrians in Crosswalks
Sponsors
Rep. Terry Morrison [D] | Rep. Rebecca Millett [D] | Rep. Paul Gilbert [D] | Rep. Scott Hamann [D] |
Rep. Charles Harlow [D] | Rep. Bryan Kaenrath [D] | Rep. Ann Peoples [D] | Rep. Diane Russell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | Senate | Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD). |
2013-03-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator MAZUREK of Knox the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2013-03-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-05 | House | On motion of Representative THERIAULT of Madawaska the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2013-03-05 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator Mazurek of Knox, REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION and ordered printed, in concurrence. |
2013-01-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-01-15 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. |
2013-01-15 | House | Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=17&snum=126 |
Text | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0021&item=1&snum=126 |