ME LD1696 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide Funding for the Maine Bicentennial Commission
Title
An Act To Provide Funding for the Maine Bicentennial Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-09 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #725 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-07-09 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #709 (Y: 109 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #483 (Y: 87 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-07-09 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #709 (Y: 109 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #483 (Y: 87 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-09 | Senate | in concurrence |
2018-07-09 | Senate | LD 1696 In Senate, July 9, 2018, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 33 IN FAVOR and 0 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2018-07-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-07-09 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 709V 109 having voted in the affirmative and 35 in the negative, with 7 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2018-07-09 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2018-06-20 | Senate | On Motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT in concurrence |
2018-02-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-02-22 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-586), in concurrence. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-586) READ and ADOPTED |
2018-02-15 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2018-02-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reports Read |
2018-02-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-02-13 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-586). |
2018-02-13 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2018-02-13 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-586) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2018-02-13 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2018-02-13 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 483 (Yeas 87 - Nays 56 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) |
2018-02-13 | House | On motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2018-02-13 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-12-22 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2017-12-22 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on December 19, 2017. |