ME LD1696 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - LD 1696 In Senate, April 29, 2016, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 28 In Favor and 6 Against, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - LD 1696 In Senate, April 29, 2016, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 28 In Favor and 6 Against, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Establish a Moratorium on Rate Changes Related to Rule Chapter 101: MaineCare Benefits Manual, Sections 13, 17, 28 and 65
Title
Resolve, To Establish a Moratorium on Rate Changes Related to Rule Chapter 101: MaineCare Benefits Manual, Sections 13, 17, 28 and 65
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2016-04-29 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #714 (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #653 (Y: 102 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - Acc Maj Ought To Pass Rep RC #592 (Y: 85 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #653 (Y: 102 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - Acc Maj Ought To Pass Rep RC #592 (Y: 85 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-29 | Senate | LD 1696 In Senate, April 29, 2016, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 28 In Favor and 6 Against, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2016-04-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-29 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 653V 102 having voted in the affirmative and 45 in the negative, with 5 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2016-04-29 | House | This Resolve, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2016-04-13 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2016-04-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-13 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin the Majority Ought to Pass Pursuant to Joint Order Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2016-04-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-12 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2016-04-12 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2016-04-12 | House | The Resolve was READ ONCE. |
2016-04-12 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 592 (Yeas 85 - Nays 61 - Absent 5 - Excused 0) |
2016-04-12 | House | On motion of Representative GATTINE of Westbrook, the Majority Ought to Pass pursuant to Joint Order 2016, H.P. 1156 Report was ACCEPTED. |
2016-04-12 | House | Reports READ. |