ME LD1688 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Improve Consistency in Terminology and within the Maine Human Rights Act
Title
An Act To Improve Consistency in Terminology and within the Maine Human Rights Act
Sponsors
Sen. Craig Hickman [D] | Sen. Anne Carney [D] | Rep. Michelle Dunphy [D] | Rep. Thomas Harnett [D] |
Sen. Heather Sanborn [D] | Rep. Rachel Talbot Ross [D] | Sen. Eloise Vitelli [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-16 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #403 (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-17 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-17 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-17 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-17 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-323). |
2021-06-17 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-17 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-323) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-17 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-17 | House | On motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-17 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-323) |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-323) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-16 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 403 Yeas 22 - Nays 13 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland theMajority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-15 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-05-21 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-21 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on May 4, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |