ME LD1685 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Create The Barbara Bush Children's Hospital Registration Plate
Title
An Act To Create The Barbara Bush Children's Hospital Registration Plate
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2018-04-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-18 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-04-18 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-18 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-348) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-482) thereto. |
2018-04-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-18 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-04-18 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-18 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-348) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-482) thereto. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2018-04-18 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-348) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-482) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-348) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-482) thereto ADOPTED |
2018-04-18 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-482) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-348) READ and ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Under further suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby it ADOPTED Committee Amendment "A" (S-348) |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-348) |
2018-04-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator COLLINS of York TAKEN FROM THE SPECIAL HIGHWAY TABLE |
2018-02-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator COLLINS of York PLACED ON THE SPECIAL HIGHWAY TABLE pending ENACTMENT |
2018-02-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-02-13 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-02-08 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-02-08 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-348). |
2018-02-08 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2018-02-08 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-348) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-348) READ and ADOPTED |
2018-02-01 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2017-12-19 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on December 19, 2017 and REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |