ME LD1683 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Clarify the Definitions of Consumer-owned Utilities

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Clarify the Definitions of Consumer-owned Utilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
2019-06-07HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-07HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-06-07HouseThis being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
2019-06-06SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2019-06-06SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-478), in concurrence.
2019-06-06SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-478) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
2019-06-06SenateREAD ONCE.
2019-06-06SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2019-06-06HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-06HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-478).
2019-06-06HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2019-06-06HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2019-05-07SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY in concurrence
2019-05-07HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-07HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY.
2019-05-07HouseCommittee on Energy, Utilities and Technology suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback