ME LD1682 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Specify That Certain Rules Regarding Services to Persons with Intellectual Disabilities or Autism Are Major Substantive Rules
Title
An Act To Specify That Certain Rules Regarding Services to Persons with Intellectual Disabilities or Autism Are Major Substantive Rules
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2016-04-13 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #627 (Y: 83 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-03-30 - House - Acc Maj Ought To Pass Rep RC #537 (Y: 83 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - House - Acc Maj Ought To Pass Rep RC #537 (Y: 83 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2016-04-13 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 627V 83 having voted in the affirmative and 66 in the negative, with 2 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained. |
2016-04-13 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2016-04-01 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2016-03-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-31 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin the Majority Ought to Pass Pursuant to Statute Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2016-03-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-30 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2016-03-30 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2016-03-30 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2016-03-30 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 537 (Yeas 83 - Nays 64 - Absent 4 - Excused 0) |
2016-03-30 | House | On motion of Representative GATTINE of Westbrook, the Majority Ought to Pass pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 5, chapter 377-A Report was ACCEPTED. |
2016-03-30 | House | Reports READ. |