ME LD1676 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Expanding the Authority of the Maine Elder Death Analysis Review Team To Investigate Deaths and Serious Injuries of Persons with Intellectual Disabilities or Autism
Title
An Act Expanding the Authority of the Maine Elder Death Analysis Review Team To Investigate Deaths and Serious Injuries of Persons with Intellectual Disabilities or Autism
Sponsors
Rep. Dale Denno [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-07-09 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #708 (Y: 79 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2018-04-17 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #608 (Y: 79 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #608 (Y: 79 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-09 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2018-07-09 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-07-09 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 708V 79 having voted in the affirmative and 64 in the negative, with 8 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained. |
2018-07-09 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2018-06-20 | Senate | On Motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2018-06-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT |
2018-05-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748. |
2018-04-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-18 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-04-18 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-18 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (H-770). |
2018-04-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-18 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-04-18 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-18 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (H-770). |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "B" (H-770) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment "B" (H-770) READ and ADOPTED |
2018-04-18 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2018-04-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (H-770) Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Reports Read |
2018-04-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-17 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-769). |
2018-04-17 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2018-04-17 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-769) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2018-04-17 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2018-04-17 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 608 (Yeas 79 - Nays 63 - Absent 9 - Excused 0) |
2018-04-17 | House | On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2018-04-17 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-12-20 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2017-12-20 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on December 18, 2017. |