ME LD1673 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Establish a Presidential Primary System in Maine
Title
An Act To Establish a Presidential Primary System in Maine
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-12 - House - Pass To Be Engrossed As Amend RC #596 (Y: 128 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2016-04-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-12 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2016-04-12 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-12 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 596 (Yeas 128 - Nays 22 - Absent 1 - Excused 0) |
2016-04-12 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-511). |
2016-04-12 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2016-04-12 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-511) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2016-04-12 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2016-04-12 | House | On motion of Representative LUCHINI of Ellsworth, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2016-04-12 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2016-04-12 | House | Later today assigned. |
2016-04-12 | House | On motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2016-04-12 | House | Reports READ. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-511) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-511) READ and ADOPTED. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator CYRWAY of Kennebec the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2016-03-24 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-24 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | On motion by Senator Mason of Androscoggin REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS |
2016-03-23 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS |