ME LD1667 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Create a Tax Credit for Maine Workers Who Have Earned Certificates from Accredited Institutions
Title
An Act To Create a Tax Credit for Maine Workers Who Have Earned Certificates from Accredited Institutions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2021-05-25 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2021-05-25 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-05-03 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-05-03 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on May 3, 2021. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1667&snum=130 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP1238&item=1&snum=130 |