ME LD1667 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Clarify Authorization for a Court Facilities Bond
Title
An Act To Clarify Authorization for a Court Facilities Bond
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-16 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. | |
2012-05-16 | (S) TAKEN from the Special Appropriations Table by Senator ROSEN of Hancock. | |
2012-03-13 | (S) On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence. | |
2012-03-12 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-12 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-417) | |
2012-03-08 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Under suspension of the rules | |
2012-03-08 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-417). | |
2012-03-08 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2012-03-07 | (S) ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. | |
2012-03-07 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-417) READ and ADOPTED. | |
2012-03-07 | (S) READ ONCE. | |
2012-03-07 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED. | |
2012-01-04 | (S) Received by the Secretary of the Senate on December 19, 2011 and REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |