ME LD1664 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Enrolled on June 12 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 12 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Increase Reimbursement Under the General Assistance Program
Title
An Act to Increase Reimbursement Under the General Assistance Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-10 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482. |
2023-07-26 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2023-06-20 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-20 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2023-06-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-209) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-535) thereto in concurrence |
2023-06-15 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-15 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2023-06-15 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-209) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-535) thereto. |
2023-06-15 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2023-06-15 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-209) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-535) thereto was ADOPTED. |
2023-06-15 | House | On motion of Representative MEYER of Eliot, House Amendment "A" (H-535) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-209) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2023-06-15 | House | On further motion of the same Representative the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby Committee Amendment "A" (S-209) was ADOPTED. |
2023-06-15 | House | On motion of Representative MEYER of Eliot, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-209) |
2023-06-15 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2023-06-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-13 | House | Later today assigned. |
2023-06-13 | House | On motion of Representative TERRY of Gorham, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. |
2023-06-13 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2023-06-12 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-12 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-209). |
2023-06-12 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2023-06-12 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-209). |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-209) READ and ADOPTED. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-07 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2023-05-22 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2023-05-22 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-04-13 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-04-13 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |