ME LD1664 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Portions of Chapters 126 and 261: Immunization Requirements for School Children, Joint Major Substantive Rules of the Department of Education and the Department of Health and Human Services
Title
Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Portions of Chapters 126 and 261: Immunization Requirements for School Children, Joint Major Substantive Rules of the Department of Education and the Department of Health and Human Services
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp Rpt RC #514 (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2018-02-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-02-22 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2018-02-22 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED in concurrence |
2018-02-20 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 514 Yeas 30 - Nays 4 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin the Majority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Reports Read |
2018-02-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-02-15 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2018-02-15 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2018-02-15 | House | The Resolve was READ ONCE. |
2018-02-15 | House | On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2018-02-15 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-11-29 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed. |
2017-11-29 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on November 27, 2017. |
2017-11-29 | House | Reported by Representative HYMANSON for the Department of Education and the Department of Health and Human Services pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 5, section 8072. |