ME LD1663 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Clarify Ranked-choice Voting Laws

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Clarify Ranked-choice Voting Laws

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-07SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-06-06HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-06HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-06-05HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-05HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-194).
2019-06-05HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2019-06-05HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (S-194) was READ and ADOPTED.
2019-06-05HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2019-06-05HouseOn motion of Representative SCHNECK of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2019-06-05HouseReports READ.
2019-06-04SenateSent down for concurrence
2019-06-04SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-194)
2019-06-04SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-194) READ and ADOPTED
2019-06-04SenateREAD ONCE
2019-06-04SenateOn motion by Senator LUCHINI of Hancock the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
2019-06-04SenateReports Read
2019-04-30HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-04-30HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS.
2019-04-30SenateCommittee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback